This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/01/2021 at 06:04:03 (UTC).

OSULLIVAN, ANNE MARIE VS SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 OSULLIVAN, ANNE MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER and BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSULLIVAN, ANNE MARIE

Defendant

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAINZ, ROBERT RYAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

09/01/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

09/01/2021:Complaint

Notice Designating Email Address

09/01/2021:Notice Designating Email Address

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/01/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/03/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

09/04/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY; SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA002067CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ