Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/09/2019 at 08:31:22 (UTC).

NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS VS LEO, JULIANA M Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LEO, JULIANA M. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS

Defendants

LEO, ROGERIO G

LEO, JULIANA M

UNKNOWN TENANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLIS, BRANDON K

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Lis Pendens

04/04/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice of Discharge/Cancellation of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served JULIANA M LEO 041819 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ROGERIO G LEO 041819 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, ROGERIO LEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, JULIANA M LEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Case 512019CC001407CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHWOOD OF PASCO HOMEOWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLIS , BRANDON K