Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 14:30:26 (UTC).

NIEHAUS, PATRICIA ANN, RAMSEY, KELLIE A Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 NIEHAUS, PATRICIA ANN, RAMSEY, KELLIE A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMSEY, KELLIE A

Decedent

NIEHAUS, PATRICIA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAY, SANDRA H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketORGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT CLOCK DATE MARCH 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER CLOCK DATE MARCH 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Determining Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Determining Exempt Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder of Summary Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Admitting Will to Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Last Will and Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000475CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, SANDRA H.