This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/08/2022 at 09:41:36 (UTC).

NICOLO, DEBORAH VS ILLUSIONS CUSTOM AUTO GRAPHICS Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 NICOLO, DEBORAH filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ILLUSIONS CUSTOM AUTO GRAPHICS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLO, DEBORAH

Defendants

STYLES, ROBERT

STYLES, SHANIE

ILLUSIONS CUSTOM AUTO GRAPHICS

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ROBERT & SHANIE STYLES ILLUSIONS CUSTOM AUTO GRAPHICS 120522

12/05/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ROBERT & SHANIE STYLES ILLUSIONS CUSTOM AUTO GRAPHICS 120522

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/09/2023 14:30; Judge: JUSTICE, JOSEPH; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ROBERT & SHANIE STYLES ILLUSIONS CUSTOM AUTO GRAPHICS 120522

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC005840SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less