This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 19:30:29 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS W J PRUETT

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against W J PRUETT. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

ABBEY GLEN PROPERTY OWNERS ASS

THOMPSON, CAITLYN DANIELLE

Not Classified By Court

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

MR COOPER

PRUETT, CAITLYN DANIELLE DANIE

PRUETT CAITLY UNKNOWN SPOUSE O

PRUETT CAITLYN D UNKNOWN SPOUS

PRUETT WILLIAM JEFFREY UNKNOWN

PRUETT, CAITLY

PRUETT, WILLIAM JEFFREY

PRUETT CAITLYN UNKNOWN SPOUSE

PRUETT, CAITLYN

PRUETT CAITLYN DANIELLE UNKNOW

PRUETT, CAITLYN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorneys

MULLIS, BRANDON K

WINSTEAD, FRANK DREW LAWSON

 

Court Documents

Motion to Withdraw AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AWARD AD LITEM ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM

09/09/2016:Motion to Withdraw AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AWARD AD LITEM ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLF

09/06/2016:Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLF

Final Disposition Form

09/06/2016:Final Disposition Form

Certificate Of Service FILED BY PLF

02/23/2016:Certificate Of Service FILED BY PLF

Certificate Of Service FILED BY PLF

12/30/2015:Certificate Of Service FILED BY PLF

Order Setting Non Jury Trial 012715 AT 1015AM

12/23/2015:Order Setting Non Jury Trial 012715 AT 1015AM

Motion For Default On JUDICIAL, CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON, CAITLYN D PRUETT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON, CAITLYN DANIELLE PRUETT, FILED BY PLTF

12/17/2015:Motion For Default On JUDICIAL, CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON, CAITLYN D PRUETT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON, CAITLYN DANIELLE PRUETT, FILED BY PLTF

Default Denied CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON ***PARTIES IN MILITARY***

12/02/2015:Default Denied CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON ***PARTIES IN MILITARY***

Default Entered ON WILLIAM J PRUETT

12/02/2015:Default Entered ON WILLIAM J PRUETT

Motion For Default On WILLIAM PRUETT; CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON; ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANELLE THOMPSON NKA CHARLES STONE

11/27/2015:Motion For Default On WILLIAM PRUETT; CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON; ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANELLE THOMPSON NKA CHARLES STONE

Affidavit Of Non Military Service WILLIAM PRUETT; CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON NKA CHARLES STONE

11/27/2015:Affidavit Of Non Military Service WILLIAM PRUETT; CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON NKA CHARLES STONE

Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J PRUETT, FILED BY PLTF

11/09/2015:Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J PRUETT, FILED BY PLTF

Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J PRUETT, FILED BY PLTF

11/09/2015:Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J PRUETT, FILED BY PLTF

Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J PRUETT

11/02/2015:Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J PRUETT

Summons Returned Served WILLIAM J PRUETT

11/02/2015:Summons Returned Served WILLIAM J PRUETT

Summons Returned Served CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON; 091015; ARMY

11/02/2015:Summons Returned Served CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON; 091015; ARMY

Summons Returned Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON; 091615; ARMY

11/02/2015:Summons Returned Served UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAITLYN DANIELLE THOMPSON; 091615; ARMY

Summons Returned Served ABBEY GLEN PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; 081215

11/02/2015:Summons Returned Served ABBEY GLEN PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; 081215

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketOrder Granting UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AWARD AD LITEM ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AWARD AD LITEM ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketOrder Granting MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketMotion For Extension Of Time FILED BY ATTY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketOrder Granting MOTION TO CORRECT AND/OR CLARIFY ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTY AD LITEM AND GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketCertificate Of Service FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketMotion TO CORRECT AND/OR CLARIFY ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTY AD LITEM AND EXPARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY ATTY AD ITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketJudge: BABB , LINDA H Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002365CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/28/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PORPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketNotice Of Filing WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABBEY GLEN PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MR COOPER is a litigant

Latest cases where Champion Mortgage Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant