This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 16:00:23 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS J J KLASKO

Case Summary

On 06/29/2015 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against J J KLASKO. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

EQUITY RESOURCES INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

BALLANTRAE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT

KLASKO, JOHN J

MOORE EILEENE E UNKNOWN SPOUSE

MOORE, EILEENE E

KLASKO JOHN J UNKNOWN SPOUSE O

Not Classified By Court

MOORE, EILEEN E.

KLASKO, JOHN JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASSEL, GARY IRA

Defendant Attorneys

MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY

HAKANSON, JEFFREY CARL

 

Court Documents

Certificate Of Title Issued To US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

05/11/2018:Certificate Of Title Issued To US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Real Auction Bid Log

04/30/2018:Real Auction Bid Log

Real Auction Fee Worksheet

04/30/2018:Real Auction Fee Worksheet

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

04/19/2018:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Proof of Publication 043018

04/10/2018:Proof of Publication 043018

Notice Of Sale 043018

03/26/2018:Notice Of Sale 043018

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 043018

03/21/2018:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 043018

Notice of Hearing 121917 AT 1PM

08/25/2017:Notice of Hearing 121917 AT 1PM

Order For Substitution Counsel

11/22/2016:Order For Substitution Counsel

Proposed Order

11/15/2016:Proposed Order

Notice Of Hearing ON 110716 @1PM

08/24/2016:Notice Of Hearing ON 110716 @1PM

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY JOHN KLASKO AND EILEENE MOORE

07/29/2016:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY JOHN KLASKO AND EILEENE MOORE

Order Denying ON DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS

07/07/2016:Order Denying ON DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS

Notice of Change of Attorney FIRM NAME FILED BY PLTF

06/24/2016:Notice of Change of Attorney FIRM NAME FILED BY PLTF

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 062916 AT 300PM

01/26/2016:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 062916 AT 300PM

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

12/09/2015:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

Default Entered ON EQUITY RESOURCES INC

12/03/2015:Default Entered ON EQUITY RESOURCES INC

Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN E MOORE, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J KLASKO, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND 2

11/30/2015:Notice Dropping Party Or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN E MOORE, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J KLASKO, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND 2

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Title Issued To US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCertificate Of Disbursements 0.00 MLD 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReal Auction Bid Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReal Auction Fee Worksheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Sale with Attached Proof of Publication SOLD TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION $100.00 MLD 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication 043018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketCertificate OF MAILING FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Sale 043018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketNotice Of Filing WITH ATTCHD CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY RESOURCES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BALLANTRAE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant