This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:10:47 (UTC).

N BREVARD ENTERPRISE LLC VS ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 N BREVARD ENTERPRISE LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SESTAK, WILLIAM G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

N BREVARD ENTERPRISE LLC

Defendants

STANLEY, CHARLENE

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO SHERIFF (PICK UP)

12/10/2018:Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO SHERIFF (PICK UP)

Response FILED BY CHARLENE STANLEY

11/30/2018:Response FILED BY CHARLENE STANLEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121918 CHARLENE STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • File Verified To This Point YA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO SHERIFF (PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • COURT Default Entered AGAINST DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Default Denied CHARLENE STANLEY *PARTY FILED PAPER*

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Order REQUIRING DEFS TO POST RENT AND SETTING HEARING 121218 AT 415PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response FILED BY CHARLENE STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED 111618 UNKOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED 111618 CHARLENE STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF, CHARLENE STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Complaint FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Case 512018CC004445CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Event Date: 12/12/2018 14:00; Judge: SESTAK, WILLIAM G; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: ES D

    Read MoreRead Less