Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 16:40:24 (UTC).

MURPHY, DEVIN PAUL VS PHP MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 MURPHY, DEVIN PAUL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PHP MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY, DEVIN PAUL

Defendants

SANTE FE AT STAGECOACH HOMEOWN

PHP MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

Not Classified By Court

CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FULGENCIO, FELIPE BASTOS

 

Court Documents

Complaint AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL W/EXHIBITS A - C

12/18/2018:Complaint AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL W/EXHIBITS A - C

Affidavit and/or Application for Indigency Status OF DEVIN PAUL MURPHY

12/18/2018:Affidavit and/or Application for Indigency Status OF DEVIN PAUL MURPHY

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

12/18/2018:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Amended Complaint AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 06/05/19 @ 11:00AM; SEAN BOYNTON ESQ REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Clerk Denied Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Case 512018SC004514SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL W/EXHIBITS A - C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit and/or Application for Indigency Status OF DEVIN PAUL MURPHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Event Date: 06/05/2019 11:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES C; Defendant Attorney: FULGENCIO, FELIPE B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHP Management Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELIPE B FULGENCIO, ESQ