This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 14:36:34 (UTC).

MSMC VENTURE LLC VS N PATEL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2015 MSMC VENTURE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against N PATEL. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MSMC VENTURE LLC

CIRAS LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN TENANT #3

PINEWALK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIO

PATEL, NALINIBEN

PATEL, RAJENDRAKUMAR

Interested Party

BAEZ, JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIMON, ASHLEY LAUREN

STORFER, RICHARD BERNARD

Defendant Attorneys

BRANDT, ALLISON JEAN

HAKANSON, JEFFREY CARL

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY RAJENDRAKUMAR AND NALINIBEN PATEL

12/10/2015:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY RAJENDRAKUMAR AND NALINIBEN PATEL

Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLTF

12/02/2015:Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLTF

Civil Cover Sheet

06/17/2015:Civil Cover Sheet

Notice Of Lis Pendens

06/17/2015:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Form C Notice to Homeowner

06/17/2015:Form C Notice to Homeowner

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, RAJENDRAKUMAR PATEL

06/25/2015:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, RAJENDRAKUMAR PATEL

Summons Returned Served NALINIBEN PATEL; 072215; NMA

07/24/2015:Summons Returned Served NALINIBEN PATEL; 072215; NMA

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

06/25/2015:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, PINEWALK HOMEOWNERS' ASSN., INC.

06/25/2015:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, PINEWALK HOMEOWNERS' ASSN., INC.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 06/11/19 @ 11:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMotion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketAffidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL ATTNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • DocketResponse To Request Production FILED BY RAJENDRAKUMAR PATEL AND NALINIBEN PATEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Lack Of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketOrder Granting MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Hearing 100516 AT 1200PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, PINEWALK HOMEOWNERS' ASSN., INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA001862CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/17/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSMC VENTURE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MARKET STREET MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Ciras LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT , ALLISON JEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hakanson, Jeffrey Carl