This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/22/2021 at 14:49:53 (UTC).

MORRIS, DIANE D, NEFF, ROBERT H Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 MORRIS, DIANE D, NEFF, ROBERT H was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS, DIANE D

Decedent

NEFF, ROBERT H

Not Classified By Court

NEFF, ROBERT HENRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PEYTON, DONALD RAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 9/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF CERTIFICATION OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP001593CPAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONALD R PEYTON