Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:24:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS WESTENBERGER, ASHLEY

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WESTENBERGER, ASHLEY. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WESTENBERGER, ASHLEY

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 121718 AT 130PM COURTROOM 2B

11/08/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 121718 AT 130PM COURTROOM 2B

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ASHLEY WESTENBERGER 120118

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 121718 AT 130PM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Case 512018SC003986SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Event Date: 12/17/2018 13:30; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA