Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 00:12:35 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS THURSTON, DEBBIE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THURSTON, DEBBIE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

THURSTON, DEBBIE

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/01/2019:Complaint

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 052019 11:00 AM 2B

04/04/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 052019 11:00 AM 2B

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Stipulation FOR SETTLEMENT; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 041219; THURSTON DEBBIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 052019 11:00 AM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019SC001484SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Event Date: 05/20/2019 11:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less