This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/31/2019 at 00:11:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PUENTES, DONNA

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PUENTES, DONNA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PUENTES, DONNA

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREIUDICE; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

11/08/2019:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREIUDICE; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved DONNA PUENTES

10/11/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved DONNA PUENTES

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVE 12519 10:00 AM 2B

10/01/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVE 12519 10:00 AM 2B

Complaint W/ATTACHMENT

09/26/2019:Complaint W/ATTACHMENT

Civil Cover Sheet

09/26/2019:Civil Cover Sheet

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

09/26/2019:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved DONNA PUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVE 12519 10:00 AM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case 512019SC004172SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Event Date: 11/25/2019 10:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less