Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:47:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS NOVOA, ANDRES

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NOVOA, ANDRES. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NOVOA, ANDRES

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

NOVOA, ANDRES F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHATANI, PAYAL YASHWANT

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 01/30/2019 @ 10:00 AM; NOVOA ANDRES

11/16/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 01/30/2019 @ 10:00 AM; NOVOA ANDRES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • County Court Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 112318; NOVOA ANDRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 01/30/2019 @ 10:00 AM; NOVOA ANDRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004093SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Event Date: 01/30/2019 10:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHATANI , PAYAL