Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:50:00 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS NEUMANN, PAUL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEUMANN, PAUL. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NEUMANN, PAUL

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 900AM COURTROOM 2B

11/16/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 900AM COURTROOM 2B

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 112018 PAUL NEMANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 900AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004092SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Order Ratifying And Approving Stipulation AND DISMISSING CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Event Date: 01/28/2019 09:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E