This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/13/2019 at 00:14:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MARCHMAN, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARCHMAN, ROBERT. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARCHMAN, ROBERT

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/08/2019:Complaint

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 060619 10:00 AM 2B

04/10/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 060619 10:00 AM 2B

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Unserved; MARCHMAN ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued/RET PROCESS SERVER 060619 10:00 AM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case 512019SC001579SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Event Date: 06/06/2019 10:00; Judge: GREY, FRANK I; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less