This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/31/2019 at 00:12:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS GARLAND, ROBYN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARLAND, ROBYN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

GARLAND, ROBYN

GARLAND, ROBYN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

Defendant Attorney

CONNELLY, MICHAEL STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ ; ROBIN GARLAND

10/19/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ ; ROBIN GARLAND

Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

09/26/2019:Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY ROBYN GARLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 102819; GARLAND ROBYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ ; ROBIN GARLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case 512019SC004134SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Event Date: 12/18/2019 09:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B; Defendant Attorney: CONNELLY, MICHAEL STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less