Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 00:11:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS BRYANT, KATEE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYANT, KATEE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BRYANT, KATEE

Not Classified By Court

MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 06/05/2019 @ 1:30 PM; BRYANT KATEE

04/05/2019:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 06/05/2019 @ 1:30 PM; BRYANT KATEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served KATEE BRYANT 041019 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 06/05/2019 @ 1:30 PM; BRYANT KATEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019SC001483SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Complaint; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Event Date: 06/05/2019 13:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less