This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/28/2021 at 00:11:37 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC VS CORRELL, RALPH

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CORRELL, RALPH. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

CORRELL, RALPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

11/23/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim

11/23/2021:Statement Of Claim

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

11/23/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 032122 @ 9 AM

11/28/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 032122 @ 9 AM

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served RALPH CORRELL (SUBSTITUTE SERVED) 12092021 NON-MILITARY

12/10/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served RALPH CORRELL (SUBSTITUTE SERVED) 12092021 NON-MILITARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/21/2022 09:00; Judge: ANDERSON, DUSTIN; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served RALPH CORRELL (SUBSTITUTE SERVED) 12092021 NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 032122 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC006576SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B