This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:07:10 (UTC).

MID AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNIT VS GUTIERREZ, JUAN E Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 MID AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNIT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ, JUAN E. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SESTAK, WILLIAM G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNIT

Defendants

GUTIERREZ, JUAN E

RODRIGUEZ, JESSICA A

Not Classified By Court

GUTIERREZ FONSECA, JUAN E.

COLONIAL GRAND AT SEVEN OAKS

RODRIGUEZ BELTRAN, JESSICA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT, CHARLES VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Default Entered AGAINST JUAN GUTIERREZ AND JESSICA A RODRIGUEZ

11/29/2018:Default Entered AGAINST JUAN GUTIERREZ AND JESSICA A RODRIGUEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal AS TO COUNT II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served POSTED 120318 JUAN E GUITIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO SHERIFF (PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Entered AGAINST JUAN GUTIERREZ AND JESSICA A RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Motion FOR JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BY DEFAULT, FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Motion For Default On AGAINST JUAN E GUITIERREZ AND JESSICA A RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 111518 JESSICA RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 111518 JUAN E GUITIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service AND VERIFICATION IN PROOF OF CLAIM, DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, JESSICA A RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, JUAN E GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Case 512018CC004507CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/9/2018

    Read MoreRead Less