This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:54:28 (UTC).

MDH PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC VS DAVIS, JOHN

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 MDH PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS, JOHN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MDH PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

DAVIS, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, DENISE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment EVICTION

01/15/2019:Final Judgment EVICTION

Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

01/09/2019:Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

Complaint FOR POSSESSION (NON RESIDENTIAL) W/EXHIBITS A - B

11/29/2018:Complaint FOR POSSESSION (NON RESIDENTIAL) W/EXHIBITS A - B

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 012419 JOHN DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Motion For Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Default Entered JOHN DAVIS (CLERKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Default for Entry by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS; JOHN DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Return of Service Served JOHN DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service JOHN DAVIS NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Certificate Of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ; JOHN DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint FOR POSSESSION (NON RESIDENTIAL) W/EXHIBITS A - B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case 512018CC004750CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.