This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 07/13/2021 at 11:33:38 (UTC).

MCGUIRE, KEVIN J VS CLOYD, KRISTIE S

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 MCGUIRE, KEVIN J filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CLOYD, KRISTIE S. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGUIRE, KEVIN J

Defendant

CLOYD, KRISTIE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OZYJOWSKI, KAREN CONTEGIACOMO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDomestic Relations/Family Law Case Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on JUNE 9, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Petition for Modification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase 512021DR002779DRAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OZYJOWSKI, KAREN CONTEGIACOMO