This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 13:26:48 (UTC).

MCCARTHY, ELVIRA Et Al VS PAGAN, JUANITA

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 MCCARTHY, ELVIRA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PAGAN, JUANITA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SESTAK, WILLIAM G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOWNSEND, LOUISE

MCCARTHY, ELVIRA

Defendant

PAGAN, JUANITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO PLTF (BY MAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Default Entered AGAINST JUANITA PAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion For (COURT'S) Default On JUANITA PAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion For Default On JUANITA PAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Affidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service JUANITA PAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Summons Returned Served 121218 JUANITA PAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Complaint FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; JUANITA PAGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case 512018CC004895CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less