This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:24:08 (UTC).

MARSH, TWILA M VS TAYLOR, DANIEL L

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 MARSH, TWILA M filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TAYLOR, DANIEL L. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSH, TWILA M

Defendant

TAYLOR, DANIEL L

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

11/14/2018:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121218 DANIEL L TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Default Entered DANIEL L TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; DNAIEL L TAYLOR 111518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/DANIEL L TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Case 512018CC004493CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less