This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 17:03:49 (UTC).

MANEELY, JESSICA VS CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 MANEELY, JESSICA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANEELY, JESSICA

Defendant

CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP

Not Classified By Court

PALM TREE DENTISTRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMLER, JASON WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA PA

07/07/2021:Notice of Filing NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA PA

Proof of Service CHILDREN & TEEN DENTAL GROUP 061521

06/21/2021:Proof of Service CHILDREN & TEEN DENTAL GROUP 061521

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued TO ATTY FOR CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA

06/15/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued TO ATTY FOR CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

06/14/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Civil Cover Sheet

06/14/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

06/14/2021:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service CHILDREN & TEEN DENTAL GROUP 061521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued TO ATTY FOR CHILDREN AND TEEN DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001382CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON W IMLER, ESQ