This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 13:22:44 (UTC).

MAIN STREET LANDING LLC VS BEKESH, RICHARD Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 MAIN STREET LANDING LLC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against BEKESH, RICHARD. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

Defendants

SPRING ENGINEERING INC

BEKESH, RICHARD

DOVE, ROLAND P

Not Classified By Court

MAIN STREET LANDING LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIPWORTH, SEAN GERALD

Defendant Attorney

SAVITZ, EDWARD OWEN

 

Court Documents

Order Denying DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ABATE TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH CHAPTER 558 WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/06/2021:Order Denying DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ABATE TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH CHAPTER 558 WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Response To Request For Admissions FILED BY MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

09/16/2021:Response To Request For Admissions FILED BY MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

Notice of Hearing 093021 @ 10:30 AM

08/20/2021:Notice of Hearing 093021 @ 10:30 AM

Notice of Hearing 093021 @ 10:30 AM TELEPHONICALLY

08/20/2021:Notice of Hearing 093021 @ 10:30 AM TELEPHONICALLY

Request For Admissions FILED BY DEFS

08/16/2021:Request For Admissions FILED BY DEFS

Response to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) FILED BY MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

07/19/2021:Response to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) FILED BY MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

Motion to Stay DF

06/28/2021:Motion to Stay DF

Notice Of Appearance DF

06/10/2021:Notice Of Appearance DF

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON SPRING ENGINEERING INC 060821

06/09/2021:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON SPRING ENGINEERING INC 060821

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON ROLAND P DOVE PE 060821 NMA

06/09/2021:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON ROLAND P DOVE PE 060821 NMA

Summons Issued And Returned To SPRING ENGINEERING, INC.

04/06/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To SPRING ENGINEERING, INC.

Summons Issued And Returned To ROLAND P. DOVE, P.E.

04/06/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ROLAND P. DOVE, P.E.

Summons Issued And Returned To RICHARD BEKESH, AIA

04/06/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To RICHARD BEKESH, AIA

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

04/05/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

04/05/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

04/05/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Civil Cover Sheet

04/01/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

04/01/2021:Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ABATE TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH CHAPTER 558 WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request For Admissions FILED BY MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 093021 @ 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 093021 @ 10:30 AM TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Motion (IN OPPOSITION) FILED BY MAIN STREET LANDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON SPRING ENGINEERING INC 060821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON ROLAND P DOVE PE 060821 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To SPRING ENGINEERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ROLAND P. DOVE, P.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To RICHARD BEKESH, AIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA000786CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HIPWORTH, SEAN GERALD