This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/24/2019 at 06:00:45 (UTC).

MAGNO, DEBORAH Et Al VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 MAGNO, DEBORAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGNO, DEBORAH

TESTA, JOSEPH

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

MCNAMARA, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KROPOG, DARRELL WAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Return of Service FOR DEFENDANT/ JAMES MCNAMARA ON 040919 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Return of Service (BY CORPORATE) FOR DEFENDANT/ ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 040819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To JAMES MCNAMARA ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • File Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case 512019CA000980CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request For Admissions ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request To Produce JAMES MCNAMARA FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request To Produce ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To JAMES MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less