This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2022 at 06:38:30 (UTC).

MAD GRAPHICS INC VS PASCO COUNTY

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 MAD GRAPHICS INC filed an Other lawsuit against PASCO COUNTY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAD GRAPHICS INC

Defendant

PASCO COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LABBEE, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

STEWART, GREGORY THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/11/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/11/2021:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk PASCO COUNTY C/O JEFFREY STEINSNYDER

08/11/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk PASCO COUNTY C/O JEFFREY STEINSNYDER

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/12/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Notice Of Appearance DF

09/07/2021:Notice Of Appearance DF

Motion To Dismiss DF

09/07/2021:Motion To Dismiss DF

Motion FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF PURCHASING ORDINANCE FILED BY DEF

09/07/2021:Motion FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF PURCHASING ORDINANCE FILED BY DEF

Notice Designating Email Address (AMENDED) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF

10/19/2021:Notice Designating Email Address (AMENDED) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing ON 010422 @930AM

11/09/2021:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing ON 010422 @930AM

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing (AMENDED) ON 010422 @930AM

11/09/2021:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing (AMENDED) ON 010422 @930AM

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing ON 010422

12/20/2021:Notice of Cancellation of Hearing ON 010422

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing ON 010422

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Telephonic Hearing (AMENDED) ON 010422 @930AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Telephonic Hearing ON 010422 @930AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address (AMENDED) FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF PURCHASING ORDINANCE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point DSP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk PASCO COUNTY C/O JEFFREY STEINSNYDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001877CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASCO COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART, GREGORY THOMAS