Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:57:27 (UTC).

MACFEETERS, THERESA R VS TAYLOR, GLENN ALLEN

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 MACFEETERS, THERESA R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAYLOR, GLENN ALLEN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACFEETERS, THERESA R

Defendant

TAYLOR, GLENN ALLEN

Not Classified By Court

MACFEETERS, THERESA ROSE

 

Court Documents

Motion To Continue (REVIEWED BY COURT - DEF TO PROVIDE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF PLANE TICKET)

03/29/2019:Motion To Continue (REVIEWED BY COURT - DEF TO PROVIDE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF PLANE TICKET)

Counter Petition Or Counter Complaint

03/28/2019:Counter Petition Or Counter Complaint

Notice of Hearing 040419 10:00 AM

02/18/2019:Notice of Hearing 040419 10:00 AM

Request TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL FILED BY DEF

01/09/2019:Request TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL FILED BY DEF

Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

11/13/2018:Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Continue (REVIEWED BY COURT - DEF TO PROVIDE PROOF OF PURCHASE OF PLANE TICKET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • File Verified To This Point BP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Motion To Continue FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Counter Petition Or Counter Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Affidavit and/or Application for Indigency Status FILED BY GLENN ALLEN TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Clerk Approved Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing 040419 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 111419 GLENN ALEN TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Copy Of ISSD SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • File Verified To This Point WM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004091SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/GLEN ALLEN TAYLOR 011019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Event Date: 04/04/2019 10:00; Judge: GREY, FRANK I; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Event Date: 01/10/2019 10:00; Judge: GREY, FRANK I; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less