Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/05/2019 at 00:11:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS WEHLAU, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEHLAU, KEVIN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I and COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WEHLAU, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES, MICHELLE KIM

 

Court Documents

Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

10/01/2019:Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ 9:00AM; KEVIN WEHLAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 512019SC004296SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Event Date: 12/18/2019 09:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less