Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/05/2019 at 00:13:18 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SANTIAGO, JOHN A

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANTIAGO, JOHN A. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SANTIAGO, JOHN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

10/01/2019:Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 102919; SANTIAGO JOHN A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/18/19 @ 1:30PM; JOHN A SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/EXHIBITS A-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 512019SC004293SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Event Date: 12/18/2019 13:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less