This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/17/2022 at 00:15:19 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS LOPEZ-PEREZ, KATELYNN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOPEZ-PEREZ, KATELYNN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LOPEZ-PEREZ, KATELYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

01/13/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim

01/13/2022:Statement Of Claim

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/13/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Notice Designating Email Address

01/13/2022:Notice Designating Email Address

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued ATTY ON 04/28/2022 @ 11:00 AM

01/14/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued ATTY ON 04/28/2022 @ 11:00 AM

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served KATELYNN LOPEZ-PEREZ

01/21/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served KATELYNN LOPEZ-PEREZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/28/2022 11:00; Judge: ANDERSON, DUSTIN; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served KATELYNN LOPEZ-PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued ATTY ON 04/28/2022 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC000199SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW