This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 10:16:45 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JONES, JOHN

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, JOHN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JONES, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

09/15/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim

09/15/2021:Statement Of Claim

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/15/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 110821 AT 10AM

09/20/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 110821 AT 10AM

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served JOHN JONES 09232021 NON-MILITARY

09/24/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served JOHN JONES 09232021 NON-MILITARY

Claim Of Exemption And Request For Hearing County JOHN JONES

10/06/2021:Claim Of Exemption And Request For Hearing County JOHN JONES

County Court Mediation Agreement

11/09/2021:County Court Mediation Agreement

Pre-Trial Conference Order

11/10/2021:Pre-Trial Conference Order

Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

02/09/2022:Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

02/15/2022:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

CONSENT Final Judgment

02/15/2022:CONSENT Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT Final Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketReopened for Other Reopen Cause on 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketReopen Date: 02/09/2022; Reopen Close Date: 02/15/2022; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty Court Mediation Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/08/2021 10:00; Judge: JUSTICE, JOSEPH; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Of Exemption And Request For Hearing County JOHN JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served JOHN JONES 09232021 NON-MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 110821 AT 10AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC005265SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL