Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:22:04 (UTC).

LOSURDO, ANNA VS FRANKE, TINA

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 LOSURDO, ANNA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FRANKE, TINA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOSURDO, ANNA

Defendant

FRANKE, TINA

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served 121318 TINA FRANKE

12/19/2018:Writ of Possession Returned Served 121318 TINA FRANKE

Affidavit Of Non Military Service TINA FRANKE

11/13/2018:Affidavit Of Non Military Service TINA FRANKE

Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/TINA FRANKE

11/13/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/TINA FRANKE

Other LETTER FROM PLTF

11/13/2018:Other LETTER FROM PLTF

Return of Service on Summons Served POSTED 111318 TINA FRANKE

11/15/2018:Return of Service on Summons Served POSTED 111318 TINA FRANKE

Default Entered TINA FRANKE (COURTS)

12/10/2018:Default Entered TINA FRANKE (COURTS)

Motion For Default On CLERKS

11/21/2018:Motion For Default On CLERKS

Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

12/10/2018:Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

Notice of Hearing 121018 1030AM

11/30/2018:Notice of Hearing 121018 1030AM

Default Denied TINA FRANKE (PARTY FILED PAPER)

11/28/2018:Default Denied TINA FRANKE (PARTY FILED PAPER)

Motion For Default On COURTS

11/21/2018:Motion For Default On COURTS

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

11/13/2018:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121318 TINA FRANKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Default Entered TINA FRANKE (COURTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • File Verified To This Point WM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice of Hearing 121018 1030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Default Denied TINA FRANKE (PARTY FILED PAPER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Answer AND REQUEST FOR HEARING FILED BY TINA FRANKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served POSTED 111318 TINA FRANKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLAINTIFF/TINA FRANKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Other LETTER FROM PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service TINA FRANKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004478CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less