This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:31:07 (UTC).

LOKHANDWALA, MURTUZA VS BURDYL, ALESIA NOLEEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 LOKHANDWALA, MURTUZA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BURDYL, ALESIA NOLEEN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOKHANDWALA, MURTUZA

Defendants

BURDYL, ALESIA NOLEEN

GENDRON, BRIAN JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served POSTED 091820 ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

09/22/2020:Summons Returned Served POSTED 091820 ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

09/17/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

09/17/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

Complaint for Eviction

09/17/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served POSTED 100920 ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO PLF (PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered AGAINST ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL AND BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAffidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For COURT'S Default On ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL AND BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL AND BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Returned Served POSTED 091820 BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served POSTED 091820 ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF; ALESIA NOLEEN BURDYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF; BRIAN JUSTIN GENDRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002479CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less