This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 11/18/2022 at 06:01:25 (UTC).

LILLIE, JAMES A VS ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 LILLIE, JAMES A filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATE. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILLIE, JAMES A

Defendants

ADAMS, JEREMY C

ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLAND, JENNIFER LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

10/19/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/19/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/19/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO JEREMY ADAMS

10/19/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO JEREMY ADAMS

Request For Copies FILED BY PLF

10/19/2022:Request For Copies FILED BY PLF

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATER LLC

10/19/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATER LLC

Request For Copies FILED BY PLF

10/19/2022:Request For Copies FILED BY PLF

Complaint

10/19/2022:Complaint

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

10/25/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

10/25/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON JEREMY C ADAMS 103122

11/10/2022:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON JEREMY C ADAMS 103122

Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATER LLC 103122

11/10/2022:Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATER LLC 103122

Notice Of Appearance DF

11/11/2022:Notice Of Appearance DF

Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

11/11/2022:Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

Request For Admissions DF

11/11/2022:Request For Admissions DF

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories DF

11/11/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories DF

Request To Produce DF

11/11/2022:Request To Produce DF

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATER LLC 103122

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON JEREMY C ADAMS 103122

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Copies FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO ADAMS FAMILY PLUMBING AND WATER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Copies FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO JEREMY ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA002700CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less