This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/01/2022 at 08:33:45 (UTC).

LICHTENBERG, KARL VS ALL OTHER UNKOWN PERSONS IN PO Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 LICHTENBERG, KARL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKOWN PERSONS IN PO. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICHTENBERG, KARL

Defendants

GAUSE, K GUNNER

ALL OTHER UNKOWN PERSONS IN PO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

05/02/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

05/02/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

05/02/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Complaint for Eviction

05/02/2022:Complaint for Eviction

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

05/04/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

05/04/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Return of Service on Summons Served ON K.GUNNER GAUSE 050522 BY POSTING

05/07/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON K.GUNNER GAUSE 050522 BY POSTING

Return of Service on Summons Served ON AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION 050522 BY POSTING

05/07/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION 050522 BY POSTING

Answer FILED BY KEVIN GUNNER GAUGE

05/10/2022:Answer FILED BY KEVIN GUNNER GAUGE

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

05/10/2022:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Certificate Of Mailing K GUNNER GAUSE AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

05/10/2022:Certificate Of Mailing K GUNNER GAUSE AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Court Registry Transaction History

05/12/2022:Court Registry Transaction History

Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

05/12/2022:Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

Notice of Hearing 053122 AT 1130AM

05/12/2022:Notice of Hearing 053122 AT 1130AM

Motion For Default On AGAINST K GUNNER GAUSE AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION / CLERKS

05/17/2022:Motion For Default On AGAINST K GUNNER GAUSE AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION / CLERKS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing ON 053122

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDefault Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDefault Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST K GUNNER GAUSE AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION / CLERKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 053122 AT 1130AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer FILED BY KEVIN GUNNER GAUGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION 050522 BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON K.GUNNER GAUSE 050522 BY POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC001553CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less