This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/13/2019 at 11:30:49 (UTC).

LEE, JAYME VS LEE, BENJAMIN A

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 LEE, JAYME filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEE, BENJAMIN A. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DISKEY, DANIEL D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DISKEY, DANIEL D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, JAYME

Defendant

LEE, BENJAMIN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GURLEY, HEATHER LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice of Limited Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY BENJAMIN LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Objection TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE HEARING THIS CAUSE FILED BY BENJAMIN LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS AND DUE DATE FILED BY BENJAMIN LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served BENJAMIN A LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To BENJAMIN A LEE RET ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Petitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Demand for Discovery WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE FILED BY JAYME LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance HEATHER L GURLEY ESQUIRE OBO JAYME LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Case 512019DR000705DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 2/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.