This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 09/16/2022 at 06:04:18 (UTC).

LARREA, PERLA VS ROSENFELD, BETTY JOAN

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 LARREA, PERLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROSENFELD, BETTY JOAN. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARREA, PERLA

Defendant

ROSENFELD, BETTY JOAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACYSZYN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

XENAKIS, SEAN-KELLY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/17/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/17/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Complaint

08/17/2022:Complaint

Request For Admissions TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

08/17/2022:Request For Admissions TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

Request To Produce DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

08/17/2022:Request To Produce DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

Interrogatories TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

08/17/2022:Interrogatories TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

Notice Designating Email Address

08/17/2022:Notice Designating Email Address

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

08/23/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Return of Service on Summons Served SHELDON ROSENFELD, 08/25/2022

08/26/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served SHELDON ROSENFELD, 08/25/2022

Notice of Limited Appearance SEAN-KELLY XENAKIS OBO BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

09/14/2022:Notice of Limited Appearance SEAN-KELLY XENAKIS OBO BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

Notice Designating Email Address

09/14/2022:Notice Designating Email Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Limited Appearance SEAN-KELLY XENAKIS OBO BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served SHELDON ROSENFELD, 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions TO DEFENDANT, BETTY JOAN ROSENFELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA002150CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less