This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:32:27 (UTC).

LAND TRUST 3325213660706 KNAP VS DINTRUFF, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 LAND TRUST 3325213660706 KNAP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DINTRUFF, CHARLES. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAND TRUST 3325213660706 KNAP

Defendant

DINTRUFF, CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIORI, CHRISTOPHE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/17/2020:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR CHARLES DINTRUFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002498CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less