This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 18:59:07 (UTC).

LAMPLUGH, ALBERT III Et Al VS BARBER, GARY S Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 LAMPLUGH, ALBERT III filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BARBER, GARY S. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAMPLUGH, ALBERT III

LAMPLUGH, KELLY

TAMPABAY CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

FLORIDA DEPT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY

YOST, AMANDA M

YOST, DAVID W SR

EAST BAY REALTY INC

BARBER, GARY S

HELTON, JAMES EDWARD JR

Not Classified By Court

SUNCOAST HIGHLAND REALTY CORPO

SUNCOAST HIGHLAND CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASSEY, STARLETT M

 

Court Documents

Certificate Of Mailing FILED BY PLTF

10/11/2021:Certificate Of Mailing FILED BY PLTF

Default Entered

10/06/2021:Default Entered

Affidavit Of Non Military Service UNABLE TO DETERMINE AS TO AMANDA M YOST

10/05/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service UNABLE TO DETERMINE AS TO AMANDA M YOST

Motion For Default On AMANDA M YOST AND EAST BAY REALTY INC

10/05/2021:Motion For Default On AMANDA M YOST AND EAST BAY REALTY INC

Correspondence TO COURT FROM JAMES HELTON

09/17/2021:Correspondence TO COURT FROM JAMES HELTON

Return of Service on Summons Served JAMES EDWARD HELTON JR; 090921

09/16/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served JAMES EDWARD HELTON JR; 090921

Return of Service on Summons Served EAST BAY REALTY 091421

09/15/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served EAST BAY REALTY 091421

Alias Summons ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER, EAST BAY REALTY INC

09/13/2021:Alias Summons ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER, EAST BAY REALTY INC

Return of Service on Summons Unserved EAST BAY REALTY INC.

09/10/2021:Return of Service on Summons Unserved EAST BAY REALTY INC.

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY AMANDA M YOST

07/30/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY AMANDA M YOST

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

07/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Complaint

07/29/2021:Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

07/29/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service UNABLE TO DETERMINE AS TO AMANDA M YOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AMANDA M YOST AND EAST BAY REALTY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence TO COURT FROM JAMES HELTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served JAMES EDWARD HELTON JR; 090921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served EAST BAY REALTY 091421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER, EAST BAY REALTY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved EAST BAY REALTY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer FILED BY FLORIDA DEPT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY AMANDA M YOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001789CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M