This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/13/2019 at 08:30:18 (UTC).

KUZMENOK, OLEG VS TURZA, MICHAEL FRANCIS J

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 KUZMENOK, OLEG filed an Other lawsuit against TURZA, MICHAEL FRANCIS J. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUZMENOK, OLEG

Defendants

TURZA, MICHAEL FRANCIS J

TURZA, MICHAEL FRANCIS JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REVAH, PHILIPPE

 

Court Documents

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

04/08/2019:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; MICHAEL FRANCIS TURZA JR

04/23/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; MICHAEL FRANCIS TURZA JR

Complaint W/EXHIBIT A

04/08/2019:Complaint W/EXHIBIT A

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served (BY POSTING) FOR DEFENDANT/ MICHAEL FRANCIS TURZA JR ON 042519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; MICHAEL FRANCIS TURZA JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case 512019CC001458CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less