Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 01/14/2019 at 13:26:48 (UTC).

KRIG, HAROLD A JR Et Al VS ETR INVESTMENTS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2009 KRIG, HAROLD A JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ETR INVESTMENTS INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRIG, HAROLD A JR

KRIG, MARY J

TAGS PRIDE PRODUCE CORPORATION

Defendants

ETR INVESTMENTS INC

MADANI, BEHROUZ

MADANI, CLAUDIA

ETR PASCO LLC

Garnishees

WACHOVIA BANK

CAG HERNANDO 649, LLC

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL A

BANK OF AMERICA NA

SILVER PALM UNITED METHODIST C

GREAT FLORIDA BANK

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA

FIRST FLORIDA BUILDING CORPORA

TIB BANK

EASTERN FINANCIAL FLORIDA CRED

Not Classified By Court

COLONIAL BANK

NKA WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL

FIRST UNION NATIONAL BANK

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COVINGTON, ANGELA M

WHITAKER, DANIEL DAVID

Other Attorneys

ELLIOTT, JAMES W

LANIGAN, ERIC ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Cancellation OF HEARING SET ON 012016

01/11/2016:Notice Of Cancellation OF HEARING SET ON 012016

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal OF GARNISHMENT; FILED BY PLTFS

12/15/2015:Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal OF GARNISHMENT; FILED BY PLTFS

Certificate Of Service FILED BY PLTFS

10/20/2015:Certificate Of Service FILED BY PLTFS

Notice Of Hearing 012016 @ 1:00PM

10/01/2015:Notice Of Hearing 012016 @ 1:00PM

Response To Request Production FILED BY GARNISHEE

08/17/2015:Response To Request Production FILED BY GARNISHEE

Request For Production FILED BY PLTFS

07/15/2015:Request For Production FILED BY PLTFS

Notice Of Appearance (LIMITED) OBO ERIC T REARDON

03/18/2015:Notice Of Appearance (LIMITED) OBO ERIC T REARDON

Notice Of Hearing 11/26/2013 AT 3:00 PM

11/22/2013:Notice Of Hearing 11/26/2013 AT 3:00 PM

Notice Of Hearing 11/26/2013 @ 3:00 PM

11/05/2013:Notice Of Hearing 11/26/2013 @ 3:00 PM

Request For Production

07/23/2013:Request For Production

Request For Production

07/23/2013:Request For Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice Of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 092718@1030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition (FIFTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition (FOURTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition (THIRD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Amended Notice of Taking Deposition AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Notice Of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Notice Of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
257 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO PROCESS SERVER; MADANI BEHROUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • PMT:CA FF GENERAL; B98665; $300.00; TAGS PRIDE PRODUCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • PMT:CA SUMMONS ISSUED; B98665; $60.00; TAGS PRIDE PRODUCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • PMT:CA ADDITIONAL DEF OVER 5; B98665; $2.50; TAGS PRIDE PRODUCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Reopen Date: 07/17/2013; Reopen Close Date: 08/01/2014; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • Reopen Date: 09/13/2010; Reopen Close Date: 09/30/2010; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • Reopen Date: 12/29/2009; Reopen Close Date: 01/11/2010; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Reopen Date: 10/16/2009; Reopen Close Date: 12/23/2009; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Reopen Date: 07/08/2009; Reopen Close Date: 12/23/2009; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • Reopen Date: 06/15/2009; Reopen Close Date: 06/15/2009; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNOVUS FINANCIAL CORP FKA GREAT FLORIDA BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where EASTERN FINANCIAL FLORIDA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where First Union National Bank of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Colonial Bank NA is a litigant