This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 20:12:06 (UTC).

KNOWLES, ANNETTE VS CHAPTERS HEALTH INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 KNOWLES, ANNETTE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CHAPTERS HEALTH INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNOWLES, ANNETTE

Defendants

CHAPTERS HEALTH INC

HERNANDO-PASCO HOSPICE INC

Not Classified By Court

HPH HOSPICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMLER, JASON WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/31/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/31/2021:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/31/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/31/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

09/02/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

09/02/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Notice of Filing PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ANNETTE KNOWLES

09/17/2021:Notice of Filing PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ANNETTE KNOWLES

Answer And Affirmative Defense

09/23/2021:Answer And Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ANNETTE KNOWLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA002050CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON W IMLER, ESQ