This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/23/2019 at 06:01:41 (UTC).

KINGSBURY, DENISE VS RAINES, JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 KINGSBURY, DENISE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAINES, JOHN. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGSBURY, DENISE

Defendants

RAINES, JOHN

SOUTHER ROAD AND BRIDGE, LLC.

SOUTHERN ROAD AND BRIDGE, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROZYNA, JONATHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY JOHN RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Response To Request For Admissions FILED BY JOHN RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Response To Request Production FILED BY SOUTHERN ROAD & BRIDGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice of Filing RETURN OF SEVICE ON DEF SOUTHERN ROAD & BRIDGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Return of Service SOUHERN ROAD & BRIDGE LLC 032819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY SOUTHERN ROAD & BRIDGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Response To Request For Admissions FILED BY SOUTHERN ROAD & BRIDGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • File Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case 512019CA000946CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To JOHN RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To SOUTHERN ROAD AND BRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY JONATHAN BROZYNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Request For Admissions FILED BY JONATHAN BAROZYNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY JONATHAN BAROZYNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Request To Produce FILED BY JONATHAN BAROZYNA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less