This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 19:51:41 (UTC).

KHAN, QAISAR VS STANLEY BLACK AND DECKER INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 KHAN, QAISAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STANLEY BLACK AND DECKER INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHAN, QAISAR

Defendants

STANLEY BLACK AND DECKER INC

WAL-MART INC

Not Classified By Court

STANLEY ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES, L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULGENCIO, FELIPE BASTOS

Defendant Attorney

RUSSOMANNO, SUZETTE LUISA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/18/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/18/2021:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/18/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/18/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/30/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/30/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/31/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/31/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Notice Of Appearance DF

09/08/2021:Notice Of Appearance DF

Return of Service on Summons Served ON WAL-MART INC 090321

09/20/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON WAL-MART INC 090321

Return of Service on Summons Served ON STANLEY BLACK AND DECKER INC 090721

09/20/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ON STANLEY BLACK AND DECKER INC 090721

Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY WAL-MART INC

09/23/2021:Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY WAL-MART INC

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFENDANT

09/27/2021:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFENDANT

Notice of Filing NOTICE OF REMOVAL

09/30/2021:Notice of Filing NOTICE OF REMOVAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Extension Of Time FILED BY WAL-MART INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON STANLEY BLACK AND DECKER INC 090721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON WAL-MART INC 090321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase Progress Notes $ 20.00 SUMMONS FEE IS DUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001921CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 8/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Stanley Access Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSOMANNO , SUZETTE LUISA