This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 13:28:29 (UTC).

KELMARK LLC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 KELMARK LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELMARK LLC

Defendants

SCOTT, VERONICA

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

Order OF DEFAULT

01/08/2019:Order OF DEFAULT

Answer FILED BY VERONICA SCOTT

12/18/2018:Answer FILED BY VERONICA SCOTT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 012519 VERONICA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Answer FILED BY VERONICA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service VERONICA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS 121218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; VERONICA SCOTT 121218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer FILED BY VERONICA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PRCESS SERVER FOR ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN CCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR VERONICA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Complaint for Eviction W/EXHIBITS A - B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Case 512018CC004876CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less