This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 08:06:20 (UTC).

KAPLAN, RITA VS ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN P Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 KAPLAN, RITA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN P. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I, ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAPLAN, RITA

Defendants

BRUCKNER, TAYLOR

DELOGES, CHRIS

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served 110421

11/18/2021:Writ of Possession Returned Served 110421

Writ of Possession ISSUED TO ATTY

10/27/2021:Writ of Possession ISSUED TO ATTY

Writ of Possession to be Issued

10/21/2021:Writ of Possession to be Issued

Default Judgment

10/19/2021:Default Judgment

Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

10/19/2021:Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

Default Entered TAYLOR BRUCKNER, CHRIS DELOGES, ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

09/09/2021:Default Entered TAYLOR BRUCKNER, CHRIS DELOGES, ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Motion For Default On AGAINST TAYLOR BRUCKNER, CHRIS DELOGES AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

09/07/2021:Motion For Default On AGAINST TAYLOR BRUCKNER, CHRIS DELOGES AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Certificate Of Mailing

08/31/2021:Certificate Of Mailing

Affidavit Of Non Military Service TAYLOR BRUCKER, CHRIS DELOGES AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

08/30/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service TAYLOR BRUCKER, CHRIS DELOGES AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Return of Service on Summons Served ALL OTHER PERSONS 082621

08/26/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ALL OTHER PERSONS 082621

Return of Service on Summons Served CHRIS DELOGES 082621

08/26/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served CHRIS DELOGES 082621

Return of Service on Summons Served TAYLOR BRUCKNER 082621

08/26/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served TAYLOR BRUCKNER 082621

Summons Issued And Returned To TAYLOR BRUCKER

08/25/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To TAYLOR BRUCKER

Summons Issued And Returned To ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

08/25/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Summons Issued And Returned To CHRIS DELOGES

08/25/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To CHRIS DELOGES

Complaint

08/23/2021:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/23/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/23/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served 110421

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered TAYLOR BRUCKNER, CHRIS DELOGES, ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST TAYLOR BRUCKNER, CHRIS DELOGES AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service TAYLOR BRUCKER, CHRIS DELOGES AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served TAYLOR BRUCKNER 082621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To TAYLOR BRUCKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To CHRIS DELOGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003288CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL KOUSKOUTIS