This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/09/2021 at 14:17:42 (UTC).

KANIA, EUGENE B JR, KANIA, GERALDINE SUSAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 KANIA, EUGENE B JR, KANIA, GERALDINE SUSAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KANIA, EUGENE B JR

Decedent

KANIA, GERALDINE SUSAN

Not Classified By Court

KANIA, GERRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELLROD, MATTHEW D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 10/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF Death cetificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP001700CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW ELLROD