This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:33:26 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS CATTERTON, DEBORAH D

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed an Other lawsuit against CATTERTON, DEBORAH D. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

CATTERTON, DEBORAH D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued And Returned To; CATTERTON DEBORAH D

01/23/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To; CATTERTON DEBORAH D

Civil Cover Sheet

01/21/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/21/2022:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/21/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Return of Service on Summons Served 021022 NMA DEBORAH D CATTERTON

02/11/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served 021022 NMA DEBORAH D CATTERTON

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 021022 NMA DEBORAH D CATTERTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To; CATTERTON DEBORAH D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 012122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC000265CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B